DC B24-0268 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-268 would clarify the eligibility of services provided by the Department on Disability Services to include individuals with solely developmental disabilities. It also would require the Mayor to seek Medicaid waivers and exemptions necessary to extend the “People with Intellectuals and Developmental Disabilities Waiver” and the “Individual and Family Supports Waiver” to individuals with developmental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental Disability Eligibility Reform Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-21CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-09-30CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-06-04CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0268 Published in the DC Register
2021-06-01CouncilReferred to Committee on Human Services
2021-05-24CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback