DC B24-0261 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act A24-0103 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006456, Expires on Sep 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Act A24-0103 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006456, Expires on Sep 15, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
New Convention Center Hotel Omnibus Financing and Development Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Title
New Convention Center Hotel Omnibus Financing and Development Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Council | Act A24-0103 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 006456, Expires on Sep 15, 2021 |
2021-06-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-06-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0103, Expires on Sep 15, 2021 |
2021-06-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 22, 2021 |
2021-06-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-06-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2021-05-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |