DC B24-0234 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0094, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Law L24-0094, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002364
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, Bill 24-234 would remove from the plan for the extension of a permanent system of highways a portion of Jackson Street, N.E., located within Lot 805, Square 3835.
Title
Abandonment of the Highway Plan for Jackson Street, N.E., S.O. 21-00463, Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Council | Law L24-0094, Effective from Mar 15, 2022 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 002364 |
2022-01-31 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2022-01-28 | Council | Act A24-0296 Published in DC Register Vol 69 and Page 000608 |
2022-01-24 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2022-01-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A24-0296 |
2022-01-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 24, 2022 |
2021-12-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2021-12-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2021-12-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2021-11-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B24-0234 |
2021-10-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2021-09-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-09-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B24-0234 Published in the DC Register |
2021-05-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |