DC B24-0126 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, Bill 24-126 would make a public health emergency a triggering event for the prohibition against price gouging. It would also allow a seasonal pricing model to protect consumers from price gouging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seasonal Pricing Price Gouging Amendment Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-11-29CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2021-10-05CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-09-30CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2021-03-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B24-0126 Published in the DC Register
2021-03-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2021-03-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback