DC B23-0983 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-10 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-10 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment Benefits Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Unemployment Benefits Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-11-06 | Council | Act A23-0435 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12989, Expires on Jan 26, 2021 |
2020-10-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-10-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0435, Expires on Jan 26, 2021 |
2020-10-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 5, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Amendment (Silverman) |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-10-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |