DC B23-0945 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0496 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13932
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0496 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13932
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Game of Skill Machines Consumer Protections Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Revised Game of Skill Machines Consumer Protections Temporary Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0496 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13932 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0496 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-10-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0945 Published in the DC Register |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading |
2020-10-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |