DC B23-0936 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-06 - Act A23-0428 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12971, Expires on Jan 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-06 - Act A23-0428 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12971, Expires on Jan 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
RPP Voluntary Exclusion Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2020
Title
RPP Voluntary Exclusion Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | Council | Act A23-0428 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12971, Expires on Jan 23, 2021 |
2020-10-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-10-26 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0428, Expires on Jan 23, 2021 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-10-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-10-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |