DC B23-0837 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-837 establishes that an action for personal injury or death and calculations of past, present, or future damages for lost earnings or impaired earning capacity may not be reduced based on race, ethnicity, or gender.
Title
Stormiyah Denson-Jackson Race and Gender Economic Damages Equality Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-07-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0837 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0837 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/45368/Introduction/B23-0837-Introduction.pdf |