DC B23-0758 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Law L23-0130, Effective from Oct 09, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12236, Expires on May 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-23CouncilLaw L23-0130, Effective from Oct 09, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12236, Expires on May 21, 2021
2020-07-17CouncilAct A23-0334 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8622
2020-07-16CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-07-08CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-07-07CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0334
2020-06-22CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 7, 2020
2020-06-09CouncilFinal Reading
2020-06-09CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2020-06-09CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-05-22CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0758 Published in the DC Register
2020-05-19CouncilFirst Reading
2020-05-18CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback