DC B23-0736 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Please refer to "Other Documents" tab for the Full Comprehensive Plan as filed. *** Please note, very large documents.
As introduced Bill 23-736 establishes and updates a broad range of goals, policies, and actions to guide public decisions by District and federal agencies.
Title
Comprehensive Plan Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-11-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-11-12 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-28 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-08-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-05-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-01 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0736 Published in the DC Register |
2020-04-23 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0736 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44573/Introduction/B23-0736-Introduction.pdf |