DC B23-0735 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Act A23-0299 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5050, Expires on Aug 02, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Act A23-0299 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5050, Expires on Aug 02, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage Relief Emergency Amendment Act of 2020 (aka "COVID-19 Supplemental Corrections Emergency Amendment Act of 2020")
Title
Mortgage Relief Emergency Amendment Act of 2020 (aka "COVID-19 Supplemental Corrections Emergency Amendment Act of 2020")
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Council - Amendment ( in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Council - Amendment ( in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0299 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5050, Expires on Aug 02, 2020 |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-05-04 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0299, Expires on Aug 02, 2020 |
2020-04-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 6, 2020 |
2020-04-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-04-21 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2020-04-21 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-04-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-04-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |