DC B23-0706 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-706 authorizes the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board (ABC Board) to allow on-premises retailers or manufacturers holding an on-site sales and consumption permit registered with ABRA’s extended hours program, and allows temporary license holders to sell, serve, and allow the consumption of alcoholic beverages until 4 a.m. It also enables them to operate 24 hours a day on those days a District of Columbia professional sports team is playing in a postseason game.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District of Champions Extension of Hours Amendment Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 7, 2020
2020-11-10CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-10-20CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-10-13CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-10-13CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0706
2020-10-08CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-09-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-09-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-03-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2020-03-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0706 Published in the DC Register
2020-03-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback