DC B23-0683 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Act A23-0251 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3465, Expires on Jun 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Act A23-0251 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3465, Expires on Jun 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Leave to Vote Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Title
Leave to Vote Emergency Amendment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Council | Act A23-0251 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3465, Expires on Jun 15, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0251, Expires on Jun 15, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 23, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-03-03 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-03-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |