DC B23-0587 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-587 authorizes the abatement of real property taxes on the real property known as the Parkside Parcel E and J Mixed Income Apartments so long as a certificate of occupancy has been issued by September 20, 2022.
Title
Parkside Parcel E and J Mixed-Income Apartments Tax Abatement Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-12-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0587 Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-17 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0587 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43875/Introduction/B23-0587-Introduction.pdf |