DC B23-0572 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act A23-0211 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1104, Expires on Apr 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act A23-0211 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1104, Expires on Apr 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With MBI Health Services, LLC
Title
Modifications to Human Care Agreement No. RM-17-HCA-MHRS-MBI-BY4-RDS Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Council | Act A23-0211 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1104, Expires on Apr 28, 2020 |
2020-01-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0211, Expires on Apr 28, 2020 |
2020-01-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 29, 2020 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-12-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-12-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |