DC B23-0509 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-509 provides prospective renters in the District who qualify for the Housing Choice Voucher Program with funds to submit up to five rental applications with accompanying background and credit checks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Rent Application Voucher Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-01-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-12-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0509 Published in the DC Register
2019-10-22CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2019-10-22CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback