DC B23-0472 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced Bill 23-472 prohibits the sale or distribution of an electronic smoking device within a quarter mile of a middle or high school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Smoking Device Sales Restriction Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2020-02-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2020-01-02CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-12-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0472 Published in the DC Register
2019-10-08CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2019-09-24CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback