DC B23-0441 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-03 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-03 - Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-441 requires Local Education Agencies to submit to the Office of the State Superintendent of Education plans to administer an annual academic assessment for all students from kindergarten to third grade to monitor progress in reading and comprehension. Among other things, it requires development of accelerated reading development programs to help students read at or above grade level, upon completion of third grade.
Title
Reading Equity Acceleration Declaration Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0441 Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-09-17 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0441 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43175/Introduction/B23-0441-Introduction.pdf |