DC B23-0433 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-433 extends the sunset provision of rent control to December 31, 2030.
Title
Rental Housing Act Extension Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0433 Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2019-09-17 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0433 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43167/Introduction/B23-0433-Introduction.pdf |