DC B23-0412 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-412 clarifies the requirements for the ignition interlock program including establishing sanctions for noncompliance.
Title
Ignition Interlock Program Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0412 Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0412 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43133/Introduction/B23-0412-Introduction.pdf |