DC B23-0348 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0022, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12637, Expires on Apr 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Law L23-0022, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12637, Expires on Apr 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Elizabeths East Redevelopment Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
St. Elizabeths East Redevelopment Support Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Council | Law L23-0022, Effective from Sep 11, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12637, Expires on Apr 23, 2020 |
2019-08-02 | Council | Act A23-0098 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 9728 |
2019-07-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-07-26 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-24 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0098 |
2019-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 29, 2019 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0348 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-25 | Council | First Reading |
2019-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |