DC B23-0318 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-17 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it decriminalizes prostitution if those involved are 18 years of age and older. It requires the establishment of a task force to study and make recommendations regarding: the effects and unintended consequences of the Reducing Criminalization of Commercial Sex Amendment Act of 2019, additional changes to criminal penalties for commercial sex, and supports for individuals engaging in commercial sex in the District of Columbia.
Title
Community Safety and Health Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-09-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0318 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0318 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42712/Introduction/B23-0318-Introduction.pdf |