DC B23-0300 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Act A23-0559 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Act A23-0559 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it identifies the remedies the Attorney General may seek in an antitrust action. Among other things, it specifies how monetary relief recovered on behalf of individuals in an action shall be distributed.
Title
Antitrust Remedies Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Act A23-0559 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000760 |
2021-01-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-11 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0559 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-10 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0300 |
2019-06-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-28 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0300 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-14 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |