DC B23-0268 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Law L23-0012, Effective from Aug 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12341, Expires on Apr 05, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Florida Avenue Multimodal Project Completion Temporary Amendment Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Avenue Multimodal Project Completion Temporary Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-20CouncilLaw L23-0012, Effective from Aug 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12341, Expires on Apr 05, 2020
2019-07-15CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2019-07-12CouncilAct A23-0073 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8067
2019-07-10CouncilEnacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0073
2019-07-03CouncilReturned from Mayor
2019-06-24CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 9, 2019
2019-06-04CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-05-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0268 Published in the DC Register
2019-05-07CouncilFirst Reading
2019-05-07CouncilAmendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen)
2019-04-23CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-04-23CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback