DC B23-0220 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Act A23-0037 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4942, Expires on Jul 02, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Act A23-0037 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4942, Expires on Jul 02, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
All-Terrain Vehicle Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
All-Terrain Vehicle Clarification Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Council | Act A23-0037 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4942, Expires on Jul 02, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-04-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 19, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0037, Expires on Jul 02, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |