DC B23-0215 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-03 - Law L23-0098, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8039
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-98 specifies the required contents of a notification of a security breach to a person whose personal information is included in a breach and clarifies time frames for reporting. It specifies security requirements for protection of personal information which if not followed may be subject to an unfair or deceptive trade practice violation. Among other things, it requires the provision of 18 months of identity theft prevention services when the breach results in the release of social security or tax identification numbers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Security Breach Protection Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-03CouncilLaw L23-0098, Effective from Jun 17, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 8039
2020-05-05CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-04-10CouncilAct A23-0268 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3923
2020-04-02CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-03-26CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0268
2020-03-13CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 27, 2020
2020-03-03CouncilFinal Reading
2020-03-03CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2020-02-04CouncilFirst Reading
2020-02-04CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2020-02-03CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-01-21CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0215
2019-11-12CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-11-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-10-25CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-03-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0215 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-21CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback