DC B23-0214 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0077, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4999
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0077, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4999
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-77 provides for an annual payment to certain providers of direct services to persons with developmental disabilities. It requires the Director of Health Care Finance and the Director of the Department on Disability Services to consider certain factors in recommending the amount of payment. Eligibility standards for payment are also established.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Direct Support Professional Payment Rate Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Law L23-0077, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 4999 |
2020-03-06 | Council | Act A23-0243 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2535 |
2020-03-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-03-03 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0243 |
2020-03-02 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-01-07 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2019-12-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0214 |
2019-11-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0214 |
2019-06-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-06-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Human Services |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0214 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |