DC B23-0205 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act A23-0075 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8078, Expires on Oct 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act A23-0075 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8078, Expires on Oct 06, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
See "Other Documents" tab for the Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute.
Title
Fiscal Year 2019 Revised Local Budget Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Council - Motion to Reconsider (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Council | Act A23-0075 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8078, Expires on Oct 06, 2019 |
2019-07-08 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0075, Expires on Oct 06, 2019 |
2019-07-08 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-06-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 8, 2019 |
2019-06-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-06-18 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2019-06-18 | Council | Motion to Reconsider (Mendelson) |
2019-05-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-05-28 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2019-05-28 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2019-04-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-03-20 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |