DC B23-0130 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it establishes an Office of Resilience within the City Administrator's Office to develop and report on the implementation of policies, programs and actions with respect to Urban Resilience. Urban Resilience is defined as the capacity of individuals, communities, institutions, businesses, and systems within a system to survive, adapt, and thrive regardless of stresses and shocks encountered.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District Of Columbia Office Of Resilience Establishment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-15CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-09-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-02-15CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0130 Published in the DC Register
2019-02-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-02-05CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback