DC B23-0054 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0536 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0536 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00008
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it allows for the voluntary surrender of opiates and drug paraphernalia at MPD stations. MPD must provide opioid antagonist rescue kits for sworn personnel and it also requires training for all sworn personnel.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. Please see the Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents."
Title
Opioid Overdose Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-17 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Act A23-0536 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00008 |
2020-12-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0536 |
2020-12-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 24, 2020 |
2020-12-01 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-17 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-11-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0054 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0054 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |