DC B23-0006 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Act A23-0017 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2690, Expires on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Act A23-0017 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2690, Expires on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. CW40855 with CELLCO Partnership DBA Verizon Wireless Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Modifications to Contract No. CW40855 with CELLCO Partnership DBA Verizon Wireless Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Council | Act A23-0017 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 2690, Expires on May 29, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-02-28 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0017, Expires on May 29, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-01-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-01-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |