DC B22-1004 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-03 - Enacted with Act Number A22-0510
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Eviction Procedure Reform Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eviction Procedure Reform Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-03CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0510
2018-10-19CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 2, 2018
2018-10-16CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-10-16CouncilRetained by the Council
2018-10-12CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback