DC B22-0949 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0586
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0586
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prohibits smoking in common areas and within 25 feet of an entrance or window of a multifamily rental accommodation.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Rental Housing Smoke Free Common Area Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0586 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0586 |
2019-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0949 |
2018-10-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0949 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |