DC B22-0944 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Signed with Act Number A22-0594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill authorizes sports wagering in the District of Columbia. It authorizes the Chief Financial Officer to adopt rules and regulations governing the conduct of sports wagering. FUNDING NOTE - Amendatory sections 316(d) & (e) of section 2(e) only are Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports Wagering Lottery Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (Evans) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (R. White) (Y: 5 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0594
2019-01-23CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0594
2019-01-10CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 25, 2019
2018-12-18CouncilFinal Reading
2018-12-18CouncilAmendment (McDuffie)
2018-12-18CouncilAmendment (Evans)
2018-12-04CouncilAmendment (Allen)
2018-12-04CouncilAmendment (R. White)
2018-12-04CouncilFirst Reading
2018-11-28CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-11-28CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0944
2018-10-17CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-09-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-09-28CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0944 Published in the DC Register
2018-09-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
2018-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback