DC B22-0839 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-04 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill regulates noise in public spaces generated from amplifying sound devices by implementing a plainly audible standard and enforcement standards. It also establishes that repeat offenders given a one time warning by law enforcement are subject to a fine not to exceed $300 or imprisonment not to exceed 10 days, or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amplified Noise Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-04CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-08-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-07-02CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-06-15CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-06-08CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0839 Published in the DC Register
2018-06-05CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2018-06-05CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback