DC B22-0813 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Act A22-0431, Expires on October 28, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Act A22-0431, Expires on October 28, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Motir Services Inc.
Title
Change Order Nos. 1-4 To Contract No. Gf-2015-c-0035 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Act A22-0431, Expires on October 28, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 8194 |
2018-07-30 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0431 |
2018-07-30 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0431 |
2018-07-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 1, 2018 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-07-03 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-06-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-06-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-05-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |