DC B22-0790 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires the Mayor to establish a uniform method by which all examining physicians, advanced practice nurses, dentists or other health professionals shall transmit a certificate of health, lead poisoning, immunization or dental health to the Mayor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Certificate Of Health Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-06-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-04-20CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0790 Published in the DC Register
2018-04-17CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2018-04-10CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback