DC B22-0787 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0194 Effective from December 13, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0194 Effective from December 13, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-194 ceremonially designates the unit block of Brandywine Street, S.E. in Squares 6171 and 6171 N in Ward 8 as Rev. W.W. Flood Way.
Title
Rev. W.w. Flood Way Designation Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Council | Law Number L22-0194 Effective from December 13, 2018 |
2018-11-02 | Council | Act A22-0476 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12022 |
2018-10-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2018-10-22 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0476 |
2018-10-22 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0476 |
2018-10-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 24, 2018 |
2018-10-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-10-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-09-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0787 |
2018-09-18 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-07-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0787 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |