DC B22-0784 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes the Board of Certified Midwives to regulate the practice of midwifery in the District of Columbia. It establishes qualifications necessary to obtain a license to practice midwifery. It also permits Certified Professional Midwives to supervise services at a Maternity birthing center. Among other things it requires every maternity center to have written Practice Guidelines establishing procedures for both normal and emergency care.
Title
Certified Professional Midwife Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0784 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-04-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0784 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40034/B22-0784-Introduction.pdf |