DC B22-0742 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill permits the disclosure of mental health information by third-party payors to health care providers, in certain circumstances. It establishes notification requirements to clients when a third-party makes such a request. It also allows clients to prevent the disclosure of mental health information.
Title
Mental Health Information Disclosure Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Council | Act A22-0570 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 960 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0570 |
2019-01-16 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0570 |
2018-12-31 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 17, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-10-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-10-04 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0742 |
2018-06-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0742 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-03-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |