DC B22-0668 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill creates a local work opportunity tax credit for employers who hire at risk employees or employees with certain barriers to employment. It establishes how businesses qualify for the tax credit and establishes the method for determining the value of the local work opportunity tax credit.
Title
Local Work Opportunity Tax Credit Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-26 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0668 Published in the DC Register |
2018-01-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-01-23 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0668 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/39616/B22-0668-Introduction.pdf |