DC B22-0603 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Act A22-0210, Expires on March 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13416
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-29 - Act A22-0210, Expires on March 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13416
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lincoln Court Designation Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
Lincoln Court Designation Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-29 | Council | Act A22-0210, Expires on March 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 13416 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0210 |
2017-12-20 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0210 |
2017-12-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 26, 2017 |
2017-12-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-30 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |