DC B22-0566 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Act A22-0183, Expires on February 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12298
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-01 - Act A22-0183, Expires on February 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12298
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Southwest Waterfront Park Bus Prohibition Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
Southwest Waterfront Park Bus Prohibition Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-01 | Council | Act A22-0183, Expires on February 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12298 |
2017-11-22 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0183 |
2017-11-22 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0183 |
2017-11-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-11-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 28, 2017 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-11-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |