DC B22-0464 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0084 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0084 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-84 authorizes the Mayor and the Council to make appointments to the Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Board of Directors.
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Board Of Directors Appointment Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0084 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | Council | Act A22-0255 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1590 |
2018-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0255 |
2018-01-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-01-05 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-12-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0464 |
2017-12-05 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0464 |
2017-11-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0464 Published in the DC Register |
2017-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2017-09-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |