DC B22-0459 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-12 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires health plans to transmit a list of the contact information of all in network providers that treat opiate use disorders. It requires the Department of Health Care Finance to determine the feasibility of expanding opioid use disorder medications offerings in methadone clinics and on appropriate reimbursement rates for treatment. It requires training for certain opioid prescribers. It requires continued treatment upon an addicted inmate entering a Department of Corrections facility. It creates a fatality review team at the Department of Behavioral Health to review overdose deaths. It requires hospital's to establish discharge protocols for individuals identified as having a substance abuse disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid Abuse Treatment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-12CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-10-20CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-10-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-09-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0459 Published in the DC Register
2017-09-19CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-09-19CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback