DC B22-0435 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Act A22-0145, Expires on January 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Act A22-0145, Expires on January 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications To Contract No. Cw28295 With Maru Solutions Incorporated Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw28295 With Maru Solutions Incorporated Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Council | Act A22-0145, Expires on January 2, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 10190 |
2017-10-04 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0145 |
2017-10-04 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0145 |
2017-09-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 6, 2017 |
2017-09-19 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-09-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |