DC B22-0281 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Act A22-0073, Expires on September 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 5614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Act A22-0073, Expires on September 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 5614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Mary's Way Designation Emergency Act Of 2017
Title
St. Mary's Way Designation Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Council | Act A22-0073, Expires on September 3, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 5614 |
2017-06-05 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0073 |
2017-06-05 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0073 |
2017-05-26 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 12, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-05-16 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-05-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |