DC B22-0266 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes an Address Confidentiality Program administered by the Office of Victim Services and Justice Grants. It creates a Violent Fatality Review Board and adds members to the Criminal Justice Coordinating Council for the District. It also increases the amount of crime victim compensation funds available for funeral and burial expenses.
Title
Victim Services Omnibus Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0266 Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-04-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0266 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/38006/B22-0266-Introduction.pdf |