DC B21-0942 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-09 - Act A21-0550, Expires on February 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-09 - Act A21-0550, Expires on February 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
H Street, N.e., Retail Priority Area Clarification Emergency Amendment Act Of 2016
Title
H Street, N.e., Retail Priority Area Clarification Emergency Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-09 | Council | Act A21-0550, Expires on February 27, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15020 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-11-29 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0550 |
2016-11-29 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0550 |
2016-11-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 5, 2016 |
2016-11-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-11-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |