DC B21-0879 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes a right to counsel in civil cases for those who meet low income criteria whenever fundamental human needs are at risk. It requires the DC Bar Foundation to adopt policies and procedures, issue requests for proposals, and make grants to designated legal services providers for the purpose of creating civil right to counsel projects. The bill also establishes a fund, the Establishment of the Civil Right to Counsel Innovation Fund, to fund the provision of legal services to individuals or groups in certain proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding Access To Justice Act Of 2016

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-10-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2016-09-30CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2016-09-23CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B21-0879 Published in the DC Register
2016-09-20CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-09-20CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback